OR SB461 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Reduces rate of tax on capital gains of personal income and corporate income and excise taxpayers. Reduces rate of tax on capital gains of personal income and corporate income and excise taxpayers. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2021. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die. .

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to decreases in capital gains tax rates; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-26SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Finance and Revenue.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback