OR SB46 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires Housing and Community Services Department to provide sample plans and grants for senior cottages. Requires Housing and Community Services Department to provide sample plans and grants for senior cottages. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for grant program. Requires department to report on program to interim committee of Legislative Assembly on or before September 15, 2025. Sunsets January 2, 2026. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to affordable housing for seniors; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and referral to Housing and Development and then to Ways and Means by prior reference (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-02-20 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development by order of the President. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Recommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Housing and Development and then Ways and Means by prior reference. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Health Care, then Ways and Means. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |