OR SB46 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires insurer that issues or renews disability income insurance policy in this state to establish, maintain and follow certain procedures with respect to claims, determinations of claims that are adverse to claimant, appeals of determinations, communications with claimant and related operations. Requires insurer that issues or renews disability income insurance policy in this state to establish, maintain and follow certain procedures with respect to claims, determinations of claims that are adverse to claimant, appeals of determinations, communications with claimant and related operations. Becomes operative on January 1, 2022] 2023. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to an insurer's treatment of claims under a disability insurance policy; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-12 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 73, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-12 | House | Third reading. Carried by Post. Passed. Ayes, 52; Excused, 8--Dexter, Drazan, Evans, Lively, Nearman, Ruiz, Stark, Valderrama. |
2021-05-11 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Riley. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Linthicum, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |