OR SB458 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Work Session held.
Pending: Senate Housing and Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows land division to separate dwelling units for new middle housing allowed in cities. Allows land division to separate dwelling units for new middle housing allowed in cities. Prohibits homeowners associations or restrictive covenants from forbidding partition. Delays applicability of limits on private middle housing restrictions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to land division for residential development.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-18SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback