OR SB456 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that Oregon estate tax is imposed only on estates of decedents dying on or before December 31, 2022. Provides that Oregon estate tax is imposed only on estates of decedents dying on or before December 31, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to estate tax; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-05-15 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2023-01-14 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |