OR SB456 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that, for estate of decedents dying on or after January 1, 2021, Oregon estate tax is not due unless value of Oregon taxable estate equals or exceeds $11.7 million. Provides that, for estate of decedents dying on or after January 1, 2021, Oregon estate tax is not due unless value of Oregon taxable estate equals or exceeds $11.7 million. Raises threshold for filing of estate tax return to gross estate valued at or more than $11.7 million. Adjusts exclusion amount and filing threshold for inflation. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to conforming estate tax to federal basic exclusion amount; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Knopp [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB456 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB456/Introduced |