OR SB454 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Department of Transportation to establish Columbia River Gorge National Scenic Area highway improvement program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to highways within Columbia River Gorge National Scenic Area.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-04-20SenateReferred to Ways and Means by prior reference.
2017-04-20SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-04-17SenateWork Session held.
2017-03-01SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Business and Transportation, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback