OR SB453 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies that Oregon vehicle dealers selling or trading otherwise taxable motor vehicles to other Oregon vehicle dealers for resale are not liable for motor vehicle dealer privilege tax on such sales or trades. Provides that such vehicle dealers are exempt from requirement of obtaining resale certificate to prove sale or trade is exempt from privilege tax. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to transactions between Oregon vehicle dealers; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Leslee Beyer [D] | Sen. Michael Dembrow [D] | Sen. James Manning [D] | Sen. Charles Riley [D] |
Rep. Mike Nearman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB453 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB453/Introduced |