OR SB45 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 10 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-25 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits life insurance policies from excluding coverage for loss of life that results from terrorism. Prohibits life insurance policies from excluding coverage for loss of life that results from terrorism. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to permitted exclusions in life insurance policies; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2021-05-13 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-25 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 72, 2021 Laws. |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-05-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-05-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-05-13 | House | Third reading. Carried by Evans. Passed. Ayes, 55; Excused, 5--Clem, Hayden, Lively, Nearman, Stark. |
2021-05-12 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 13, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-11 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-10 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-04-28 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-07 | House | Referred to Business and Labor. |
2021-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 2--Manning Jr, Thomsen. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |