OR SB445 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes Rural Traffic Safety Grant Fund to provide grants to rural cities for installation and improvement of traffic control devices and crosswalks. Establishes Rural Traffic Safety Grant Fund to provide grants to rural cities for installation and improvement of traffic control devices and crosswalks. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to Department of Transportation for deposit in Rural Traffic Safety Grant Fund. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to traffic safety; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-03-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-14SenateReferred to Transportation, then Ways and Means.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback