OR SB443 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires electric companies to reimburse qualified customers up to $250 for purchase price of backup power source when power shutoff is likely to occur and power shutoff will likely last for eight or more hours. Requires electric companies to reimburse qualified customers up to $250 for purchase price of backup power source when power shutoff is likely to occur and power shutoff will likely last for eight or more hours. Requires customer to demonstrate reliance on medically necessary device that uses power or onsite water pump as primary water source, and household income at or below 200 percent of federal poverty guidelines to qualify for reimbursement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to backup power.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-02-28SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-01-14SenateReferred to Energy and Environment.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback