OR SB438 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires entity that provides educational loans to annually provide institution of higher education with fact sheet for each enrolled student receiving loan from entity that details estimates of educational loans student received, total amount of educational loans student will owe at graduation, amount student will have to pay each month to service loans, number of monthly payments needed to service loans and date on which educational loans will be serviced in full. Requires institution to provide student with copy of fact sheet on annual basis during student orientation.
Title
Relating to transparency of student loans.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB438 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB438/Introduced |