OR SB436 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 10 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-06-17 - President signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies terminology by changing statutory references to "youth offender" to "adjudicated youth.". Modifies terminology by changing statutory references to "youth offender" to "adjudicated youth."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to adjudicated youth.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-17SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-15SenateSenate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr.
2021-06-10HouseThird reading. Carried by Lewis. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Reschke; Excused, 2--Moore-Green, Nearman.
2021-06-09HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-08HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-07HouseSecond reading.
2021-06-03HouseRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed.
2021-05-27HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-11HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-03-22HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-03-15HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-10SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-03-10SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 5--Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen.
2021-03-04SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-04SenateRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-02-04SenateWork Session held.
2021-01-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB436
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB436/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB436/House%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB436/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB436/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31084
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=503240
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32741
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=529641
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=530610

Bill Comments 750

feedback