OR SB436 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies terminology by changing statutory references to "youth offender" to "adjudicated youth.". Modifies terminology by changing statutory references to "youth offender" to "adjudicated youth."
Title
Relating to adjudicated youth.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-10 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-27 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to resolve conflicts. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-18 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Chapter 489, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-21 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 21; Nays, 8--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-10 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lewis. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Reschke; Excused, 2--Moore-Green, Nearman. |
2021-06-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 10, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 9, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-07 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-03 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed A-Engrossed. |
2021-05-27 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2021-03-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 5--Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thomsen. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |