OR SB436 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes county to adopt education funding protection ordinance for up to 10 years if at least 50 percent by area of county is subject to certain exemption or special assessment programs under ad valorem property tax statutes or if county has population of 100,000 or less. Provides that education funding protection ordinance may offer incentive for owner to withdraw land from certain conservation exemption or special assessment programs and disincentive for owner to sell land into exempt ownership. Provides that education funding protection ordinance may prohibit land outside boundaries of incorporated city and urban growth boundary from being newly approved for certain conservation exemption or special assessment programs unless land of equivalent value and class within county is removed from same exemption or special assessment program. Provides that education funding protection ordinance may prohibit state, county or local government, with certain exceptions, from acquiring land within county outside boundaries of incorporated city and urban growth boundary unless land of equivalent value and class within county is sold or transferred to taxable ownership or use. Allows acquisition for certain transportation or utility uses. Authorizes taxpayer suit for writ of mandamus to enforce these provisions. Becomes operative on January 1, 2018. Applies to property tax years beginning on or after July 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to county education funding protection ordinances; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Finance and Revenue. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB436 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB436/Introduced |