OR SB435 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires long term care facilities and residential facilities to update infection prevention and control protocols at any time Centers for Disease Control and Prevention forecasts upcoming pandemic. Requires long term care facilities and residential facilities to update infection prevention and control protocols at any time Centers for Disease Control and Prevention forecasts upcoming pandemic. Authorizes virtual inspections of long term care facilities and residential facilities if on-site inspection foreclosed by natural disaster or pandemic. Increases frequency of on-site inspections of residential facilities.
Title
Relating to community-based care regulations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB435 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB435/Introduced |