OR SB43 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Enrolled on July 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-07 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on July 6 2017 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-07-07 - At Desk upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies laws relating to lobbying. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to lobbying; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-07-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-05 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | At Desk upon adjournment. |
2017-07-06 | House | Third reading as Special Order of Business. Carried by Rayfield. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 3--Barreto, Post, Reschke; Excused, 1--Boone. |
2017-07-05 | House | Second reading. |
2017-07-05 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2017-07-05 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-07-01 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-06-15 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-17 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-05-17 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Boquist. Passed.Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Girod, Kruse, Linthicum, Thatcher; excused, 1--Olsen. |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Work Session cancelled. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Rules. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |