OR SB428 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, July 19, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends for one year sunset on Task Force on Universal Health Care and extends deadline for task force to submit recommendations to Legislative Assembly. Extends for one year sunset on Task Force on Universal Health Care and extends deadline for task force to submit recommendations to Legislative Assembly. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to universal health care; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 18 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, July 19, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 579, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-19 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Hayden. Passed. Ayes, 42; Nays, 12--Boshart Davis, Breese-Iverson, Cate, Drazan, Levy, Morgan, Owens, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Stark, Wallan; Excused, 1--Smith G; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Bonham, Holvey, Smith Warner, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 24, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-22 | House | Rules suspended. Rules suspended. Carried over to June 23, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-22 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-21 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-21 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-21 | House | Rules suspended. First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Patterson. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Johnson, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Human Services. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-15 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Health Care. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |