OR SB427 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends certain provisions setting forth renewable portfolio standard requirements and acquisition processes to reinstitute requirements and processes in effect on March 7, 2016. Repeals provisions directing certain electric companies to eliminate coal-fired resources from electric companies' allocation of electricity on or before January 1, 2030. Repeals provisions setting forth programs for transportation electrification and procurement of energy from community solar projects.
Title
Relating to elimination of requirements for which a public utility that supplies electricity may request from the Public Utility Commission an increase in rates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation, then Environment and Natural Resources. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB427 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB427/Introduced |