OR SB425 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Provides that Legislative Assembly finds and declares that telecommunicators are first responders. Provides that Legislative Assembly finds and declares that telecommunicators are first responders. Provides that telecommunicator qualifies as police officer under Public Employees Retirement System. Provides that telecommunicator employed on effective date of Act is entitled to service in retirement system as police officer for all service performed as telecommunicator.].

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to telecommunicators.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-30SenateEffective date, January 1, 2022.
2021-06-30SenateChapter 278, 2021 Laws.
2021-06-11SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-03SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-01HouseThird reading. Carried by Morgan. Passed. Ayes, 54; Absent, 1--Wright; Excused, 1--Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Drazan, Post, Reschke, Speaker Kotek.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-25HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-24HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-20HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-17HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Business and Labor.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-01SenateThird reading. Carried by Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 2--Boquist, Heard.
2021-03-31SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-16SenatePublic Hearing and Work Session held.
2021-02-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Labor and Business.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB425
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB425/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB425/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB425/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB425/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/31415
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=511225
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/32465
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=526367

Bill Comments 750

feedback