OR SB423 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits law enforcement agencies from employing person as law enforcement officer unless person has completed psychological screening to determine person's fitness to serve as law enforcement officer. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to psychological screening for law enforcement officers; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Effective on the 91st day following adjournment sine die. |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 78, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-04-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-04-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-04-25 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 60. |
2019-04-24 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-23 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-18 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-03-20 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-03-18 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Frederick, Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 30. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |