OR SB415 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Adds Department of Education employees, school district board members and public charter school governing body members to list of mandatory reporters of child abuse. Adds Department of Education employees, school district board members and public charter school governing body members to list of mandatory reporters of child abuse.
Title
Relating to mandatory reporting of child abuse.
Sponsors
Sen. Leslee Beyer [D] | Rep. John Lively [D] | Sen. Laurie Monnes Anderson [D] | Rep. Teresa Alonso Leon [D] |
Rep. Alissa Keny-Guyer [D] | Rep. Ronald Noble [R] | Rep. Sheri Malstrom Schouten [D] | Rep. Joseph Zika [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Education be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Education be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-10 | Senate | Chapter 176, 2019 Laws. |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-05-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-16 | House | Third reading. Carried by Reardon. Passed. Ayes, 59; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Williamson. |
2019-05-15 | House | Carried over to May 16, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-14 | House | Carried over to May 15, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-13 | House | Carried over to May 14, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-09 | House | Carried over to May 13, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-08 | House | Carried over to May 9, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-07 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-06 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 7, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 6, 2019 Calendar. |
2019-05-01 | House | Carried over to May 2, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-04-30 | House | Carried over to May 1, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-04-29 | House | Second reading. |
2019-04-25 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-04-22 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-04-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-03-15 | House | Referred to Education. |
2019-03-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Beyer. Passed. Ayes, 26; Excused, 4--President Courtney, Riley, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Subsequent referral rescinded by order of the President. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Education be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, then Education. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |