OR SB414 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-13 - Work Session scheduled.
Pending: Senate Housing and Development Committee
Hearing: Apr 13 @ 1:00 pm in Remote C
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Directs Oregon Business Development Department to study benefits and feasibility of establishing state office of community livability to foster volunteer cleanup efforts. Directs Oregon Business Development Department to study benefits and feasibility of establishing state office of community livability to foster volunteer cleanup efforts. Requires department to submit report of findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly related to economic development no later than September 15, 2022. Sunsets January 2, 2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to community livability.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-13SenateWork Session scheduled.
2021-02-25SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Housing and Development.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback