OR SB412 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Allows local governments, charter schools, school districts and education service districts located in Idaho border counties to freeze minimum wage at rate in effect on July 1, 2016, and opt out of future increases, with annual adjustment based on consumer price index. Allows qualifying local government to opt out on behalf of all employers under jurisdiction of local government. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to ability of certain entities bordering Idaho to opt out of state minimum wage requirement; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-07SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Workforce.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback