OR SB41 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Adds officer who is certified as parole and probation officer and is employed full-time by State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision to definition of "parole and probation officer." Declares emergency, effective on passage. Provides that certification of person employed by State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision does not lapse if person meets certain requirements.] Adds officer who is certified as parole and probation officer and is employed full-time by State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision to definition of "parole and probation officer." Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to employees of the State Board of Parole and Post-Prison Supervision; and declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls

2021-06-03 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-08SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-03HouseThird reading. Carried by Morgan. Passed. Ayes, 49; Excused, 6--Alonso Leon, Boshart Davis, Clem, Owens, Smith DB, Wright; Excused for Business of the House, 5--Drazan, Holvey, Rayfield, Sanchez, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-02HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar.
2021-06-01HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-28HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-24HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-13HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-03-18SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Heard.
2021-03-18SenateThird reading. Carried by Thomsen. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 2--Boquist, Heard.
2021-03-17SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-15SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-02-22SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-03SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Education.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback