OR SB409 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prescribes information related to courses of study offered by school district that district school board must ensure is provided on school district's website. Prescribes information related to courses of study offered by school district that district school board must ensure is provided on school district's website. Declares emergency, effective September 1, 2023.
Title
Relating to the provision of information for courses of study offered by school districts; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Kim Thatcher [R] | Rep. Lily Morgan [R] | Sen. Cedric Hayden [R] | Sen. David Smith [R] |
Sen. Suzanne Weber [R] | Rep. Boomer Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-25 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2023-04-13 | House | Referred to Education. |
2023-04-12 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Patterson, Sollman. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Thatcher, excused, granted unanimous consent to vote aye. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Weber. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 2--Manning Jr, Patterson; Excused, 1--Gorsek. |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Carried over to 04-11 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Carried over to 04-10 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Carried over to 04-06 by unanimous consent. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Second reading. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Referred to Education. |
2023-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |