OR SB409 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands applicability of certain laws requiring reporting and investigating of sexual conduct in schools to include sexual conduct by students. Expands applicability of certain laws requiring reporting and investigating of sexual conduct in schools to include sexual conduct by students. Creates civil action for damages for failure by certain school employees to make report of suspected sexual conduct. Directs Department of Education to evaluate criminal records checks to determine percentage of total number of criminal records checks requested by private schools that indicated person being checked engaged in sexual conduct toward child. Requires department to report results of evaluation to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to education. Declares emergency, effective July 1, 2021.
Title
Relating to sexual conduct toward children; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB409 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB409/Introduced |