OR SB408 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Specifies reasons for which Oregon Liquor Control Commission may delay processing, approving or denying application for marijuana licensure. Specifies reasons for which Oregon Liquor Control Commission may delay processing, approving or denying application for marijuana licensure. Authorizes commission to revoke, suspend or restrict marijuana license for reasons including diversion of marijuana to interstate or illicit market and introduction into regulated market of cannabinoids or marijuana not produced by commission licensee or tracked in commission system. Requires commission to consider mitigating factors when revoking, suspending or restricting license. Authorizes commission to revoke marijuana retailer license for specified reasons. Requires commission to establish by rule schedule of numbers and types of violations that indicate disregard for law by applicant or licensee. Requires commission to report, not later than December 31, 2021, and December 31, 2022, to interim committee of Legislative Assembly related to judiciary on rulemaking related to establishment of violations schedule and public safety. Allows commonly owned marijuana producers to transfer to one another marijuana and usable marijuana. Defines "commonly owned." Allows marijuana producer to receive specified marijuana items from marijuana processor. Specifies information required in transfer manifest for transport of marijuana. Requires commission to adopt rules to allow marijuana producer to receive specified amount of marijuana seeds from any source in Oregon. Allows person 21 years of age or older to possess up to two ounces of marijuana in public place. Directs commission to adopt rules related to tetrahydrocannabinol concentration in single serving of cannabinoid product or cannabinoid concentrate or extract. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to marijuana; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, June 23, 2021. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 397, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 19; Nays, 11--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Heard, Kennemer, Knopp, Linthicum, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Lively. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-18 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to General Government. |
2021-05-10 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist. |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 8--Anderson, Boquist, Findley, Girod, Kennemer, Robinson, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 4--Burdick, Heard, Johnson, Linthicum. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and requesting return to President's desk for referral to another committee. Referral denied by order of the President. |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Labor and Business. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |