OR SB400 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-01-17 - Referred to Workforce, then Tax Credits.
Pending: Senate Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Creates income tax credit for certain employers that provide paid family leave to employees, including paid sick time taken to care for family members of employees. Applies to tax years beginning on or after January 1, 2018, and before January 1, 2024. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a paid family leave tax credit for employers; prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Workforce, then Tax Credits.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback