OR SB40 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-16 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Requires all private security providers to use same application process for certification or licensure. Expands type of employers of public safety officers required to provide access to personnel records to Department of Public Safety Standards and Training. Clarifies application of criminal records check law to persons certified or licensed by department. Exempts department from law requiring governmental agencies to use electronic fingerprint capture technology for purpose of conducting criminal records checks.
Title
Relating to public safety standards.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-02 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-16 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-16 | Senate | Chapter 228, 2017 Laws. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-30 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-24 | House | Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed.Ayes, 56; Nays, 1--Evans; Excused, 3--Boone, Kennemer, Smith G. |
2017-05-23 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 24, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Second reading. |
2017-05-04 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-05-02 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-02-22 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Thatcher. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Johnson, Steiner Hayward. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Carried over to 02-21 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Carried over to 02-16 by unanimous consent. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |