OR SB4 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, August 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Effective date, August 6, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Directs System of Care Advisory Council to appoint executive director. Directs Oregon Health Authority to study and make recommendations for improving coordination of youth mental health services among state agencies. Requires authority to submit report on findings to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022.] Sunsets January 2, 2023.] Directs System of Care Advisory Council to appoint executive director. Authorizes executive director to employ staff. Modifies council's reporting requirements. Directs council, Department of Human Services and Oregon Health Authority to submit biennial joint report regarding expenditures on state system of care services and supports to interim committee of Legislative Assembly. Modifies council's authority and duties. Clarifies council's authority to direct expenditures of moneys appropriated or otherwise made available for purpose of supporting duties of council. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to youth with specialized needs; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and request referral to Rules (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective date, August 6, 2021. |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Chapter 670, 2021 Laws. |
2021-08-06 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-26 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Reynolds. Passed. Ayes, 54; Excused, 4--Dexter, Hayden, Smith G, Wilde; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Drazan. |
2021-06-25 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-24 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-24 | House | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2021-06-21 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2021-06-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Gelser. Passed. Ayes, 25; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Linthicum; Excused, 2--Johnson, Manning Jr. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Without recommendation as to passage and be referred to Rules. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |