OR SB399 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that refusal to obey lawful order issued by peace officer or parole and probation officer does not constitute crime of interfering with a peace officer or parole and probation officer unless order is to move back and keep distance while officer is performing lawful duties. Provides that refusal to obey lawful order issued by peace officer or parole and probation officer does not constitute crime of interfering with a peace officer or parole and probation officer unless order is to move back and keep distance while officer is performing lawful duties.
Title
Relating to the crime of interfering with a peace officer or parole and probation officer.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB399 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB399/Introduced |