OR SB398 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-0)
Status: Passed on June 11 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Creates crime of intimidation by display of a noose. Creates crime of intimidation by display of a noose. Punishes by maximum of 364 days' imprisonment, $6,250 fine, or both.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to intimidation by display of a noose.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-01 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-05-11 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-04HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-03SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-01HouseThird reading. Carried by Ruiz. Passed. Ayes, 54; Absent, 3--Nearman, Reschke, Wright; Excused, 1--Evans; Excused for Business of the House, 2--Drazan, Post.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 27, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-25HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 26, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-24HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 25, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-20HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-19HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-11HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-04HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-04-07HouseReferred to Judiciary.
2021-04-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-01SenateVote explanation(s) filed by Linthicum.
2021-04-01SenateThird reading. Carried by Burdick, Manning Jr. Passed. Ayes, 27; Nays, 1--Linthicum; Excused, 2--Boquist, Heard.
2021-03-31SenateSecond reading.
2021-03-26SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-03-10SenateWork Session held.
2021-03-02SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback