OR SB397 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-3)
Status: Passed on August 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-18 - Effective date, January 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies procedures for motions to set aside conviction, arrest, citation, charge, finding of contempt of court or judgment of guilty except for insanity. Modifies procedure for filing motion] procedures for motions to set aside conviction, arrest, citation, or] charge, finding of contempt of court or judgment of guilty except for insanity. Eliminates fees, fingerprinting and background check] filing fee and requires person to provide fingerprint card and criminal record check fee, if required, directly to Department of State Police. Reduces waiting period for filing motion if person was revoked from probation , is seeking to set aside Class B felony or was convicted of other offense] or state elects not to proceed with prosecution. Modifies waiting periods for filing of motion for conviction or guilty except for insanity judgment based upon offense classification. Aligns time period prior to filing of motion, during which person may not have any other convictions other than motor vehicle violations, to waiting period. Authorizes prosecuting attorney to object to motion to set aside conviction or guilty except for insanity judgment within 120 days of motion. Provides that court shall grant motion to set aside arrest, citation or charge, or motion to set aside conviction if no objection received. Modifies standard for granting motion over objection. Prohibits prosecuting attorney from conditioning plea offer on defendant's waiver of ability to set aside conviction. Prohibits prosecuting attorney from conditioning agreement not to object to entry of guilty except for insanity judgment on defendant's waiver of ability to set aside judgment. Prohibits criminal history data provider from including in criminal history report information that fails to reflect material changes to criminal history occurring more than 60 days before date of report. Provides that violation of prohibition constitutes unlawful trade practice.
Title
Relating to expungement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting referral to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Engrossed.) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-18 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2022. |
2021-08-18 | Senate | Chapter 486, 2021 Laws. |
2021-07-14 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-22 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 1--Hayden; Excused, 1--Smith G. |
2021-06-21 | House | Second reading. |
2021-06-18 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-06-16 | House | Referred to Ways and Means. |
2021-06-16 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Boquist, Heard. |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 24; Nays, 5--Boquist, Girod, Heard, Robinson, Thatcher; Excused, 1--Manning Jr. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2021-06-11 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Returned to Full Committee. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-06-05 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Public Safety. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Ways and Means. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary and Ballot Measure 110 Implementation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |