OR SB395 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Requires Higher Education Coordinating Commission to, on annual basis, work with Department of Human Services, each public university and each community college to determine number and graduation rates of former foster children and current foster children at each college or university. Requires commission to make information available to public and to use information when conducting annual evaluation of public universities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to foster children at post-secondary institutions of education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-06 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments and requesting subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage, but with amendments and referred to Ways and Means by prior reference. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to President's desk for referral to another committee (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-22SenateEffective date, January 1, 2018.
2017-06-22SenateChapter 332, 2017 Laws.
2017-06-14SenateGovernor signed.
2017-06-09HouseSpeaker signed.
2017-06-08SenatePresident signed.
2017-06-06HouseThird reading. Carried by Reschke. Passed.Ayes, 53; Nays, 2--Nearman, Post; Excused, 5--Johnson, McKeown, Nosse, Power, Stark.
2017-06-05HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 6, 2017 Calendar.
2017-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 5, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-31HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 1, 2017 Calendar.
2017-05-30HouseSecond reading.
2017-05-30HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2017-05-23HouseWork Session held.
2017-05-16HousePublic Hearing held.
2017-05-02HouseReferred to Higher Education and Workforce Development.
2017-05-01HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2017-04-27SenateThird reading. Carried by Dembrow. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--Baertschiger Jr, Monroe, Prozanski.
2017-04-26SenateSecond reading.
2017-04-25SenateSubsequent referral rescinded by order of the President.
2017-04-25SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments and subsequent referral to Ways and Means be rescinded. (Printed A-Eng.)
2017-04-18SenateWork Session held.
2017-04-13SenateWork Session held.
2017-04-11SenateWork Session held.
2017-03-23SenatePublic Hearing held.
2017-02-27SenateRecommedation: Without recommendation as to passage and be returned to Pres. for referral. Referred to Education by order of the President and then Ways and Means by prior reference.
2017-02-22SenateWork Session held.
2017-01-17SenateReferred to Human Services, then Ways and Means.
2017-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/Overview/SB395
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB395/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB395/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB395/A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB395/Enrolled
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/24532
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/25215
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/25466
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=404639
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/26052
Roll Callhttps://olis.leg.state.or.us/liz/2017R1/Measures/MeasureVotes?id=414534

Bill Comments

feedback