OR SB395 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, June 30, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 30 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-30 - Effective date, June 30, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to driving while under the influence of intoxicants; declaring an emergency; and providing for criminal sentence reduction that requires approval by a two-thirds majority.
Title
Relating to driving while under the influence of intoxicants; declaring an emergency; and providing for criminal sentence reduction that requires approval by a two-thirds majority.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-30 | Effective date, June 30, 2011. | |
2011-06-30 | Chapter 598, 2011 Laws. | |
2011-06-30 | Governor signed. | |
2011-06-30 | Co-Speakers signed. | |
2011-06-29 | President signed. | |
2011-06-27 | Rules suspended. Third reading. Carried by Olson. Passed. Ayes, 57; Nays, 2--Boone, Greenlick; Excused, 1--Clem. | |
2011-06-27 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-24 | Recommendation: Do pass. | |
2011-06-24 | Work Session held. | |
2011-06-22 | Referred to Rules. | |
2011-06-22 | First reading. Referred to the desks of the Co-Speakers. | |
2011-06-22 | Third reading. Carried by Prozanski. Passed. Ayes, 25; nays, 4--Atkinson, Johnson, Kruse, Whitsett; excused, 1--Boquist. | |
2011-06-21 | Taken from 06-21 Calendar and placed on 06-22 Calendar on voice vote. | |
2011-06-20 | Second reading. | |
2011-06-17 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng. bill. (Printed B-Eng.) | |
2011-06-16 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-27 | Referred to Rules by order of the President. | |
2011-04-27 | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be referred to Rules. (Printed A-Eng.) | |
2011-04-21 | Work Session held. | |
2011-04-20 | Work Session held. | |
2011-03-09 | Public Hearing held. | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-01-10 | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |