OR SB393 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs state agency of executive department that establishes policy providing that agency will refrain from enforcing law to report to committee or interim committee of Legislative Assembly.
Title
Relating to state agency policies providing that agency will not enforce law.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | House | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2017-03-21 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Ferrioli. Passed.Ayes, 27; excused, 3--DeBoer, Frederick, Thatcher. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to General Government and Accountability. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |