OR SB391 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Passed on July 7 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-07 - Effective date, June 23, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes county to allow owner of lot or parcel within rural residential zone to construct one accessory dwelling unit on lot or parcel, subject to certain restrictions. Authorizes county to allow owner of lot or parcel within rural residential zone to construct one accessory dwelling unit on lot or parcel, subject to certain restrictions. Specifies that single-family dwelling and accessory dwelling on same lot or parcel are considered single unit for purposes of calculating exemptions from ground water rights requirements. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to accessory dwelling units in rural residential areas; and declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading in Concurrence (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - House - House Committee Do pass with amendments to the A-Eng bill. (Printed B-Eng.) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-07 | Senate | Effective date, June 23, 2021. |
2021-07-07 | Senate | Chapter 396, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-15 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-14 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments and repassed bill. Ayes, 27; Nays, 3--Boquist, Heard, Robinson. |
2021-06-07 | House | Third reading. Carried by Zika. Passed. Ayes, 57; Excused, 3--Grayber, Hayden, Nearman. |
2021-06-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 7, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 3, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-06-01 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments and be printed B-Engrossed. |
2021-05-25 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-20 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-11 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-04-20 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2021-04-15 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Vote explanation(s) filed by Heard. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Dembrow, Findley. Passed. Ayes, 28; Nays, 1--Heard; Excused, 1--Linthicum. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Possible Work Session cancelled. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Public Hearing Cancelled. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Housing and Development. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |