OR SB386 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Governor signed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Directs county sheriffs, municipal police departments, university police departments and Oregon State Police to develop policies regarding parental notification of interviews of child witnesses and to submit report regarding policies developed to interim committees of Legislative Assembly by September 15, 2022. Requires investigator, prior to interviewing child who witnessed or is victim of act under investigation, to notify child that child may request presence of parent or guardian during interview.] Directs county sheriffs, municipal police departments, university police departments and Oregon State Police to develop policies regarding parental notification of interviews of child witnesses and to submit report regarding policies developed to interim committees of Legislative Assembly by September 15, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to interviews of child witnesses; and prescribing an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-15SenateGovernor signed.
2021-06-08HouseSpeaker signed.
2021-06-07SenatePresident signed.
2021-06-02HouseThird reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Drazan, Speaker Kotek.
2021-06-01HouseRules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-28HouseCarried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment.
2021-05-27HouseRules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar.
2021-05-26HouseSecond reading.
2021-05-26HouseRecommendation: Do pass.
2021-05-19HouseWork Session held.
2021-05-12HousePublic Hearing held.
2021-05-04HouseReferred to Human Services.
2021-04-27HouseFirst reading. Referred to Speaker's desk.
2021-04-22SenateThird reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard.
2021-04-21SenateSecond reading.
2021-04-19SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.)
2021-04-06SenateWork Session held.
2021-02-11SenatePublic Hearing held.
2021-01-19SenateReferred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery.
2021-01-11SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback