OR SB386 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Effective date, September 25, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Directs county sheriffs, municipal police departments, university police departments and Oregon State Police to develop policies regarding parental notification of interviews of child witnesses and to submit report regarding policies developed to interim committees of Legislative Assembly by September 15, 2022. Requires investigator, prior to interviewing child who witnessed or is victim of act under investigation, to notify child that child may request presence of parent or guardian during interview.] Directs county sheriffs, municipal police departments, university police departments and Oregon State Police to develop policies regarding parental notification of interviews of child witnesses and to submit report regarding policies developed to interim committees of Legislative Assembly by September 15, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to interviews of child witnesses; and prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-02 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-19 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Effective date, September 25, 2021. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Chapter 335, 2021 Laws. |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2021-06-08 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-06-07 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-06-02 | House | Third reading. Carried by Noble. Passed. Ayes, 53; Excused, 3--Clem, Nearman, Smith Warner; Excused for Business of the House, 4--Boshart Davis, Bynum, Drazan, Speaker Kotek. |
2021-06-01 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to June 2, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-28 | House | Carried over to June 1, 2021 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2021-05-27 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 28, 2021 Calendar. |
2021-05-26 | House | Second reading. |
2021-05-26 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2021-05-19 | House | Work Session held. |
2021-05-12 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to Human Services. |
2021-04-27 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Lieber. Passed. Ayes, 28; Excused, 2--Frederick, Heard. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second reading. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Human Services, Mental Health and Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |