OR SB380 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on July 7 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-07 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires State Parks and Recreation Department to set aside certain number of campsites to be available for reservation only by disabled veterans during first 30 days of any applicable reservation period. Requires department to report on implementation of rules for setting aside campsites for reservation by disabled veterans to Senate Committee on Veterans and Emergency Preparedness on or before February 15, 2018. Becomes operative January 1, 2018. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to reservations for use of state parks; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-07 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Assigned to Subcommittee On Natural Resources. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Veterans and Emergency Preparedness. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |