OR SB361 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Modifies prudent investor rule to allow trustee to consider settlor's or beneficiaries' personal values, including settlor's or beneficiaries' desire to engage in sustainable or socially responsible investment strategies aligning with settlor's or beneficiaries' social, environmental, governance or other values or beliefs, and beneficiaries' financial needs, when making investment decisions. Modifies prudent investor rule to allow trustee to consider settlor's or beneficiaries' personal values, including settlor's or beneficiaries' desire to engage in sustainable or socially responsible investment strategies aligning with settlor's or beneficiaries' social, environmental, social and] governance factors of investments] or other values or beliefs, and beneficiaries' financial needs, when making investment decisions.
Title
Relating to the prudent investor rule.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-08-08 | Senate | Chapter 546, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-07-23 | Senate | Chapter 546, 2019 Laws. |
2019-07-15 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-25 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-06-18 | House | Third reading. Carried by Smith Warner. Passed. Ayes, 44; Nays, 14--Barreto, Bonham, Boshart Davis, Findley, Hayden, Lewis, Nearman, Noble, Post, Reschke, Smith DB, Smith G, Sprenger, Wallan; Excused, 1--Leif; Excused for Business of the House, 1--Speaker Kotek. |
2019-06-17 | House | Second reading. |
2019-06-14 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-06-13 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-06-10 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to Rules. |
2019-05-30 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Burdick. Passed. Ayes, 18; Nays, 10--Baertschiger Jr, Bentz, Boquist, Girod, Hansell, Heard, Knopp, Linthicum, Thatcher, Thomsen; Excused, 2--Olsen, Winters. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-05-28 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass the A-Eng. bill. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Public Hearing and Work Session held. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Referred to Rules by order of the President. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |