OR SB359 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on July 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-06 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Limits amount of appeal fee that city or county may charge for quasi-judicial review of city or county decisions on land use application. Requires city or county to refund appeals fee and transcript fee when appellate authority of city or county declines to review decision. Prohibits city or county from charging fee for appeal of final decision of city or county to Land Use Board of Appeals.
Title
Relating to fees for appeal of local land use decisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-06 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2015-01-12 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Measures/Overview/SB359 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2015R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB359/Introduced |