OR SB356 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-17 - Effective date, January 1, 2020.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Permits detailed parenting plan to include instructions regarding notification requirements for specified matters.
Title
Relating to parenting plans.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 54 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House Committee Do Pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2020. |
2019-06-17 | Senate | Chapter 289, 2019 Laws. |
2019-06-07 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2019-06-03 | House | Speaker signed. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | President signed. |
2019-05-30 | House | Third reading. Carried by Stark. Passed. Ayes, 54; Nays, 2--Hernandez, Smith G; Excused, 1--Williams; Excused for Business of the House, 3--Boles, McLain, Williamson. |
2019-05-29 | House | Carried over to May 30, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-28 | House | Carried over to May 29, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-27 | House | Carried over to May 28, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-23 | House | Carried over to May 27, 2019 Calendar by virtue of adjournment. |
2019-05-22 | House | Second reading. |
2019-05-20 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-05-14 | House | Work Session held. |
2019-05-09 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2019-05-01 | House | Public Hearing cancelled. |
2019-04-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-04-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Fagan. Passed. Ayes, 25; Excused, 5--Burdick, Olsen, President Courtney, Taylor, Winters. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second reading. |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |