OR SB350 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows county with no population growth, and city within county with no population growth, to adopt exception to any statewide land use planning goal for certain purposes, with exceptions. Requires Land Conservation and Development Commission to review and approve proposed exception within 60 days of receiving notice from county or city. Permits person adversely affected by adoption of exception to obtain judicial review of exception. Directs Oregon Business Development Department to monitor adoption of exceptions by counties with no population growth and cities within counties with no population growth. Appropriates moneys from General Fund to department for monitoring costs. Requires department to submit report to interim committee of Legislative Assembly no later than September 15, 2022. Declares emergency, effective on passage.
Title
Relating to land use planning that does not comply with goals in rural counties without population growth; declaring an emergency.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Measures/Overview/SB350 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2019R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB350/Introduced |