OR SB35 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Directs State Department of Agriculture to administer Oregon Hemp State Program for production, processing and sale of hemp. Directs State Department of Agriculture to administer Oregon Hemp State Program for production, processing and sale of hemp. Changes term "industrial hemp" to "hemp." Requires department to conduct criminal records check of applicants for licensure to grow hemp. Allows department to identify and require by rule licensure for other activities related to hemp. Becomes operative January 1, 2022. Takes effect on 91st day following adjournment sine die.
Title
Relating to hemp; prescribing an effective date.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources and Wildfire Recovery. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB35 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB35/Introduced |