OR SB35 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Passed on June 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-08 - Effective date, January 1, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Increases threshold amount that must be met before person is required to submit motor vehicle accident report.
Title
Relating to motor vehicle accident reports.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Committee Do Pass the A-Eng bill (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | Senate | Effective date, January 1, 2018. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Chapter 189, 2017 Laws. |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-05-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-05-23 | House | Third reading. Carried by McLain. Passed.Ayes, 58; Nays, 1--Rayfield; Excused, 1--Heard. |
2017-05-22 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 23, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-18 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 22, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-17 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 18, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-16 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 17, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-15 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 16, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-11 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 15, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-10 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 11, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-09 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 10, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-08 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 9, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-04 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 8, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-03 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 4, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-02 | House | Rules suspended. Carried over to May 3, 2017 Calendar. |
2017-05-01 | House | Second reading. |
2017-04-27 | House | Recommendation: Do pass. |
2017-04-26 | House | Work Session held. |
2017-04-19 | House | Public Hearing held. |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Transportation Policy. |
2017-03-01 | House | First reading. Referred to Speaker's desk. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Third reading. Carried by Monroe. Passed.Ayes, 28; excused, 2--Baertschiger Jr, Boquist. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Second reading. |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Recommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng.) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Business and Transportation. |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |