OR SB348 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-25 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Modifies firearm permit provisions of Ballot Measure 114 (2022). Directs Department of Justice to study ways to address unlawful possession of firearms, and to provide results of study to interim committees of Legislative Assembly no later than December 31, 2024.] Sunsets January 2, 2025.] Modifies firearm permit provisions of Ballot Measure 114 (2022). Specifies where person may apply for permit to purchase firearm and adds eligibility requirement. Provides that information obtained during application process, during criminal background check and within database of permit holders is exempt from disclosure as public record. Extends time, from 30 to 60 days from receipt of application, by which permit agent must issue permit to qualified applicant or mail reasons for denial in writing to applicant. Increases maximum fee that may be charged for initial application for and renewal of permit. Specifies portion of fee payable to Department of State Police for conducting criminal background check. Provides that permit is only valid for purchase or acquisition of certain specified firearms while permit holder is under 21 years of age. Establishes alternatives to firearms training course or class that may be used to satisfy requirement of proof of completion of firearm safety course for permit. Provides that permits are not required for firearm transfers until July 1, 2024. Establishes temporary exception to permit requirement for transfer of certain firearms until July 1, 2026. Establishes permanent exception to permit requirement for active duty law enforcement and military. Requires gun dealer to allow 72 hours to elapse between receipt of unique approval number from Department of State Police, indicating successful completion of criminal background check, and transfer of firearm to purchaser. Modifies affirmative defense language for large capacity magazine provisions of Ballot Measure 114 (2022). Provides that challenge to legality of Act must be commenced in Circuit Court for Marion County. Declares emergency, effective on passage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to firearms; declaring an emergency.

Sponsors

No sponsor information available at this time.

Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2023-06-25SenateIn committee upon adjournment.
2023-05-24SenateAssigned to Subcommittee On Capital Construction.
2023-04-14SenateReferred to Ways and Means by order of the President.
2023-04-14SenateMinority Recommendation: Do pass with different amendments. (Printed A-Eng. Minority)
2023-04-14SenateRecommendation: Do pass with amendments. (Printed A-Eng). Requesting referral to Ways and Means.
2023-04-04SenateWork Session held.
2023-03-27SenatePublic Hearing held.
2023-03-27SenateInformational Meeting held.
2023-01-12SenateReferred to Judiciary.
2023-01-09SenateIntroduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk.

Oregon State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Measures/Overview/SB348
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB348/Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB348/Senate%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB348/Senate%20Minority%20Amendments%20to%20Introduced
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB348/Minority%20Report%20A-Engrossed
Texthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB348/A-Engrossed
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23695
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24099
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24269
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/23696
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24398
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24399
Amendmenthttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/ProposedAmendment/24471
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/66309
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267709
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267216
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/267648
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269441
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77550
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269874
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/CommitteeMeetingDocument/269794
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/77631
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78137
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78238
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78341
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78343
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78344
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78345
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78579
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78595
Supplementhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/Downloads/MeasureAnalysisDocument/78596
Roll Callhttps://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2023R1/CommitteeReports/MajorityReport/35128

Bill Comments

feedback