OR SB34 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Failed on June 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-26 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes aviation jet fuel within definition of motor vehicle fuels for purposes of subjecting supply facilities to inspection by State Department of Agriculture. Includes aviation jet fuel within definition of motor vehicle fuels for purposes of subjecting supply facilities to inspection by State Department of Agriculture.
Title
Relating to motor vehicle fuels.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-26 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Transportation. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |
Oregon State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Measures/Overview/SB34 |
Text | https://olis.oregonlegislature.gov/liz/2021R1/Downloads/MeasureDocument/SB34/Introduced |