OR SB339 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - In committee upon adjournment.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes land used primarily for cultivating crops within definition of "rangeland" for purposes of organizing rangeland protection association and providing fire protection for rangeland.
Title
Relating to rangeland protection associations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Committee Do pass and requesting referral to Ways and Means (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | In committee upon adjournment. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means by order of the President. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Recommendation: Do Pass and be referred to Ways and Means. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Work Session held. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Public Hearing held. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | Introduction and first reading. Referred to President's desk. |